Trustees THE PEACE MUSEUM
Charity Number: 1061102

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Michael Shaw | Trustee | 17 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Pearl Meredith Irene Johns | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prathivadi Bhayankaram Anand | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Rachel Julian | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Saoirse Kezia Cowley | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Bernard Aiden Conlon | Trustee | 17 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Ivan Hutnik | Trustee | 17 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Aisling Philippa Serrant | Trustee | 16 May 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.