THE SOCIETY FOR ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY ANALYTICAL METHODS TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion and support for analytical chemistry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 March 1997: Standard registration
- THE ANALYTICAL METHODS TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DEREK STEVENSON CChem FRSC | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
IAN DAVID LUMLEY CChem MRSC | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALAN JOHN HANDLEY CCHEM FRSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR GILLIAN GREENWAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR FRANK SWEETING CCHEM MRSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr ROGER WOOD OBE MChemA | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR COLIN STEPHEN CREASER CCHEM FRSC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JAMES NOEL MILLER CCHEM FRSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.90k | £29.62k | £26.71k | £29.98k | £33.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.43k | £14.35k | £6.54k | £7.21k | £8.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.95k | £6.83k | £2.08k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST MADE 1ST FEBRUARY 1956
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE ACQUISITION AND DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE IN REGARD TO METHODS OF CHEMICAL ANALYSIS AND THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS AS ANALYTICAL CHEMISTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 The Marina
Deal
CT14 6NS
- Phone:
- 01304694718
- Email:
- ian_lumley@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window