AL-NOOR FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish, maintain and conduct a school for the education of boys and girls so as to be an independent school within the meaning of the expression as defined in the Education Act 1944.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 March 1997: Standard registration
- AL-NOOR FOUNDATION (Working name)
- ALNOOR MUSLIM PRIMARY SCHOOL (Working name)
- AL-NOOR INDEPENDENT SCHOOL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Majid Khan | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Talha Choudhury | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
SADIQ KOTHIA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MUHAMMED ILYAS MIRZA | Trustee |
|
||||||
IMRAN HAFIZ | Trustee |
|
||||||
IMRAN KHAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ZULFIQAR AHMED | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.16m | £818.91k | £758.42k | £3.30m | £428.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06m | £888.02k | £837.18k | £1.24m | £846.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.63k | £16.23k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £146.55k | £54.39k | £211.16k | £280.02k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £210.19k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £825.74k | £465.43k | £315.73k | £300.76k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £191.73k | £274.74k | £0 | £238.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £24.36k | £21.34k | £2.48m | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £952.34k | £826.48k | £744.44k | £1.14m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £107.13k | £61.54k | £59.80k | £101.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.16k | £8.18k | £8.93k | £8.53k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £32.95k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JANUARY 1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 2 APRIL 2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/04/2013
Charitable objects
(1) TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN, AND CONDUCT A SCHOOL FOR THE EDUCATION (AND TRAINING) OF BOYS AND GIRLS SO AS TO BE AN INDEPENDENT SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THAT EXPRESSION AS DEFINED IN THE EDUCATION ACT 1944. (11) THE SETTING UP OF READING ROOMS AND LIBRARIES. (111) THE PROVISION OF HELP AND GUIDANCE FOR STUDENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Al Noor Foundation
Unit C2
Newton Industrial Estate
Eastern Avenue West
ROMFORD
RM6 5SD
- Phone:
- 0203 384 6899
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window