Financial history THE DARLEY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 1061141
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £5.57k £5.57k £8.34k £8.81k £3.36k
Total expenditure £2.49k £2.49k £11.10k £5.72k £4.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A