TRINITY ST STEPHEN SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small events aimed at pupils & families eg. cake sales, easter raffle, mini Christmas fair, hog roast. Larger public events eg. summer fete, car boot sale, Ladies Pamper evening.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 07 March 1997: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abigail Robins | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katy Gore | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Le Rossignol | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nina Daley | Trustee | 20 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.38k | £6.74k | £10.77k | £18.45k | £17.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.15k | £8.84k | £22.16k | £4.57k | £8.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 08 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1997 AS AMENDED ON 4 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVE OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECTIVE THE ASSOCIATION MAY: A. DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. B. ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. C. PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES OR ITEMS FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS) AS THE COMMITTEE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE GOVERNING BODY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trinity St. Stephen First School
Vansittart Road
WINDSOR
Berkshire
SL4 5DF
- Phone:
- 07948612640
- Email:
- office@tssfirst.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window