THE ARTHUR KENNEDY BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 March 1997: Standard registration
- 17 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.15k | £3.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £528 | £705 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 04 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 21 July 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 28TH FEBRUARY 1997 AND 26 MARCH 1997
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED IN THE TEXTILE RENTAL LAUNDRY AND DRY CLEANING INDUSTRY AND SUPPLIERS ASSOCIATED HEREWITH (OTHER THAN THE FOUNDER AND HIS SPOUSE); TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER 25 YEARS OF AGE WHOSE PARENTS OR GUARDIANS ARE OR HAVE BEEN EMPLOYE DIN THE INDUSTRY (OTHER THAN THE FOUNDER OR HIS SPOUSE) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window