Register of Charities - The Charity Commission SIMON KEMPSON

Charity number: 219435-21
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 8 JULY 1879 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 3 FEBRUARY 1911 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1966
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF HENLEY-IN-ARDEN
Registration history
  • 08 April 1965: Standard registration
  • 22 July 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of