Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ALTAR ORNAMENTS TRUST
Charity Number: 220084-2
Removed charity
Governing document
ASSIGNMENT AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6TH DECEMBER 1956, AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 12TH DECEMBER 1978 AND 12TH APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE MANSFIELD HOUSE UNIVERSITY SETTLEMENT
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Registration history
- 16 June 1994: Standard registration
- 04 April 1995: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.