Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ELIZABETH GIBSON

Charity number: 220596-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 9 AUGUST 1929 AND 5 NOVEMBER 1963 15 JULY 1992
Charitable objects
SUBSIDIARY TRANSFERRED TO 261616- FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF SUTTON.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF SUTTON
Registration history
  • 11 March 1964: Standard registration
  • 21 January 1994: Removed
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of