Register of Charities - The Charity Commission CLOTHING AND BREAD CHARITY

Charity number: 202380-1
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL OF 12 MAY 1925,INCLOSURE AWARD DATED 18 APRIL 1798 AND SCHEME OF 11TH FEBRUARY 1991
Charitable objects
CLOTHES AND BREAD FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF GREAT CHEVERELL. FUNDS TRANSFERRED TO THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE POOR'S GROUND: COMMISSIONERS' SCHEME OF 11 FEBRUARY 1991.
Area of benefit
GREAT CHEVERELL
Registration history
  • 16 April 1962: Standard registration
  • 11 February 1991: Removed
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of