Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JOHN MATHER
Charity number: 221088-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 22 APRIL 1969 AND 27 NOVEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE PARISH OF GOLBORNE AS CONSTITUTED ON 22/03/1892 WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED , HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Registration history
- 25 July 1963: Standard registration
- 12 October 1993: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.