Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JOHN COLTON
Charity Number: 222862-1
Linked charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 26 JULY 1861, 13 MARCH 1896 AND 11 APRIL 1963 AS AMENDED ON 20 FEBRUARY 1997 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74(2)(D) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE DESERVING POOR RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF EMBSAY-WITH-EASTBY
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EMBSAY-WITH-EASTBY
Registration history
- 10 March 1964: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.