JOHN SIMPSON JUNIOR
Charity Number: 224621-7
Removed charity
Charity overview
Governing document
SCHEME OF 26 NOVEMBER 1880 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES OF 12 JULY 1887 AND 3 JANUARY 1899
Charitable objects
1)PAYMENT TO THE VICAR OF WINLATON FOR THE POOR OF THAT PARISH 2)FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF RYTON
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF RYTON AND WINLATON
Registration history
- 08 October 1963: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.