Register of Charities - The Charity Commission CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS GERRARD

Charity number: 226897-2
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 21 MARCH 1890, 16 SEPTEMBER 1949 AND 18 MARCH 1952
Charitable objects
ASSISTANCE OF DISCHARGED PRISONERS PRIMARILY WHO HAVE BEEN IMPRISONED IN PRESTON PRISON; OR WHO HAD BEEN COMMITTED FROM MAGISTRATES COURTS PREFERABLY WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF PRESTON OR THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF PRESTON AND COUNTY OF LANCASTER
Registration history
  • 19 March 1964: Standard registration
  • 23 February 2001: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 23 February 2001: Funds transferred to 226171-17 NACRO CHARITY FOR PRISONERS AND FAMILIES OF SERVIN...
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of