Register of Charities - The Charity Commission COMMANDING OFFICERS CENTRAL FUND

Charity number: 227317-8
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 26 AUGUST 1952, 19 SEPTEMBER 1961, 5 JULY 1962
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES OF ANY OF THE REGULAR UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT AND IF NOT REQUIRED BY THE REGULAR UNITS MAY BE APPLIED FOR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES IN RESPECT OF ANY OTHER UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 24 February 1964: Standard registration
  • 17 January 1992: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names

No other names