Charity overview PRESIDENT OF THE REGIMENTAL INSTITUTE'S CENTRAL FUND
Charity number: 227317-9
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 26 AUGUST 1952, 19 SEPTEMBER 1961, 5 JULY 1962
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF EQUIVALENT PURPOSES OF ANY OF THE REGULAR UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT AND IF NOT REQUIRED BY THE REGULAR UNITS MAY BE APPLIED FOR EQUIVALENT PURPOSES IN RESPECT OF ANY OTHER UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 24 February 1964: Standard registration
- 17 January 1992: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.