Register of Charities - The Charity Commission ST ROSES CONVENT, STROUD

Charity number: 228848-2
Removed charity
Governing document
DEEDS OF 10TH JUNE 1915, 22ND JULY 1921, 1ST SEPT., 1923, SCHEME OF 29TH JULY 1945 AND FURTHER DEEDSOF 10TH MARCH 1945 AND 6TH DECEMBER 1950.
Charitable objects
RELIGIOUS CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE CONGREGATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 22 August 1963: Standard registration
  • 02 September 1992: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names

No other names