Charity overview EDKINS TRUST
Charity number: 232868-31
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL DATED 5 NOVEMBER 1896 JUDGEMENT OF THE SUPREME COURT OF CHINA DATED 28 NOVEMBER 1905 DEED OF APPOINTMENT DATED 9 APRIL 1953 AND SCHEME DATED 16 JUNE 1966
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE DEVOTED TO AN EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTION IN CENTRAL CHINA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 01 July 1965: Standard registration
- 03 June 2005: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 03 June 2005: Funds transferred to 1097842-31 EDKINS TRUST
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.