MANSE OR DWELLING HOUSE FOR THE PASTOR OR MINISTER
Charity number: 235165-3
Removed charity
Charity overview
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1876 AND SCHEMES OF 3 AUGUST 1974 AND 31 OCTOBER 1979
Charitable objects
MANSE OR DWELLING HOUSE FOR THE PASTOR OR MINISTER FOR THE TIME BEING OF WALLACE GREEN CHURCH.
Area of benefit
BERWICK-UPON-TWEED
Registration history
- 06 December 1965: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.