Charity overview JOSEPH BUTLER
Charity number: 236712-5
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL OF 24 MAY 1776 AND SCHEME OF 2 AUGUST 1929 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION UNDER S44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992 DATED 21 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE POOR MEMBERS OF ABINGDON BAPTIST CHAPEL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ABINGDON
Registration history
- 19 March 1965: Standard registration
- 15 February 1994: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.