Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JOHN POPE
Charity number: 203566-4
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED OF 1281 AND SCHEMES OF 20 JUNE 1876, 26 FEBRUARY 1901, 13 AUGUST 1907, 19 JANUARY 1934.
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF POOR IN ANCIENT PARISH OF ARRETON.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF ARRETON
Registration history
- 01 February 1962: Standard registration
- 27 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.