Register of Charities - The Charity Commission DOCTOR LEONARD RABY

Charity number: 203927-1
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 2.2.1923 AND 19.9.1946 AS AMENDED ON 14.8.1957
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE BOROUGH OF DEVIZES, PARTICULARLY FOR THE PROVISION OF EXTRA COMFORTS FOR YOUNG CHILDREN AND THE AGED.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF DEVIZES
Registration history
  • 12 April 1962: Standard registration
  • 25 August 1995: Removed
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of