Register of Charities - The Charity Commission JOHN DAY FUND
Charity number: 244700-28
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL PROBATE REGISTRY 29 MARCH 1935 VARIED BY SCHEME OF 27TH JANUARY 1971 AS AMENDED ON 15 JUNE 1993 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
AUGMENTATION OF THE INCOME OF THE INCUMBENT OF CHRIST CHURCH BLACKLANDS HASTINGS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 06 December 1965: Standard registration
- 24 September 1996: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.