Register of Charities - The Charity Commission DERBY ST PETER FUND
Charity number: 244700-36
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED DATED 14 NOVEMBER 1921 AS AMENDED ON 19 JULY 1993 AND 20 JULY 1993 BY RESOLUTIONS PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 43(2)C AND SECTION 44 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1992.
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTAINANCE AND REPARATION OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST.PETER
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 27 September 1965: Standard registration
- 05 October 1993: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.