MOSSWOOD MISSION HALL (TRUST 1188)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Vicarage, parsonage, residence for curate, church or chapel, mission room, parish room, class room, meeting or lecture room, or sunday school. Known as St Barnabas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 22 June 1961: Standard registration
- MOSSWOOD MISSION HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PETER HART | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 201 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 567 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 April 2021 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 22 FEBRUARY 1961
Charitable objects
A) AS A SITE FOR OR AS A VICARAGE PARSONGE HOUSE OR RESIDENCE FOR A CURATE CHURCH OR CHAPEL OR MISSION ROOM PARISH ROOM OR CLASSROOM MEETING OR LECTURE ROOM OR SUNDAY SCHOOLS.B) THE CELEBRATION OF DIVINE SERVICE IN ACCORDENCE WITH THE RITES AND CEREMONIES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.C) THE PAYMENT OF THE CHURCH EXPENSES OF THE SAID PARISH AND THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE CHURCH AND ITS FURNISHINGS OR THE CHURCHYARD OR ANY OF THE SAID BUILDINGS.D) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT END OR PURPOSE HAVING IN VIEW THE NEEDS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RESIDING IN THE SAID PARISH OF CANNOCK ST. LUKE OR ELSEWHERE AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CANNOCK ST. LUKE OR ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 CUMBERLEDGE HILL
RUGELEY
WS15 4SB
- Phone:
- 01543 502131
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window