RURAL MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support rural churches in their growth and development and assist in the planting of new rural churches.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£801,376
Donations and legacies | £726.21k | |
Charitable activities | £2.29k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £71.99k | |
Other | £880 |
Total expenditure:
£339,882
Raising funds | £7.10k | |
Charitable activities | £332.79k | |
Other | £0 |
£126,617 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £332.79k | |
Retained for future use | £461.49k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £7.10k | |
Charitable expenditure | £332.79k | |
Retained for future use | £588.11k |
People

4 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 May 1962: Standard registration
- RURAL MINISTRIES (Working name)
- DATCHET EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP (Previous name)
- DATCHET EVANGELICAL FELLOWSHIP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN RALPH SPURGEON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kevin Karl Gladwell | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Yann Dubreuil | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Lea | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Taylor | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL SUSANS | Trustee | 30 November 2011 |
|
|||||
ELAINE FISHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £175.85k | £93.07k | £104.41k | £235.58k | £801.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £302.46k | £264.02k | £249.23k | £239.96k | £339.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £726.21k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.29k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £71.99k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £880 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £708.58k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £332.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.08m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00m | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £772.41k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.29k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION, INCORPORATED 29TH MARCH 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 23RD FEBRUARY 1962, 25TH JUNE 1971, 28TH OCTOBER 1975, 30TH JANUARY 1976 AND 31ST JANUARY 1977 AND 9TH DECEMBER 1998. as amended on 18 Nov 2023
Charitable objects
3.1 The objects for which the Charity is established are to initiate, support, organise, maintain, equip, manage, promote or assist in any work in connection with the propagation of the Christian Gospel in accordance with the Basis of Faith, by itself or by or together with any other body or church or person or persons. 3.2 The Basis of Faith as at the date of these Articles is: BASIS OF FAITH We believe: 1. That Jesus is the Christ, real, fully human, and fully God. We believe that Jesus came to show us what God is like and what a God honouring life looks like. We accept many people use God-substitutes to give their lives meaning instead of God. We believe that the risen Christ is the only way to God, that people need to turn to God and have their lives restored, and that this is made possible through Jesus’ life, death, and resurrection. We believe God reconciles the whole of creation to himself through Jesus. 2. In the one God who communes in three persons – the Father, the Son, and the Holy Spirit, and that all are jointly active in creation, salvation, and in empowering us today. 3. God created us to be His image bearers and have a relationship with Him. We believe that this relationship has been broken, and cannot be earned, nor is it our right, but rather the gift of God through all who place their hope and trust in Jesus. We believe this is good news, and we are called to help others love Jesus more. We believe that Jesus intercedes for all people today. 4. The Holy Spirit is at work in renewal, enabling us to encounter Jesus personally in each believer as they seek to worship and witness in their everyday lives. 5. The Bible is God’s inspired word, in which we find life, hope and wisdom. 6. That being a Christian isn’t a thing we do just on Sundays, that Church isn’t something that just happens in a building, and that God’s grace abounds everywhere – sometimes where we least expect it. We believe that Jesus Christ is coming again. We believe Christians need to join in with the mission that Jesus started and bring good news to all people and creation. We believe that Church is part of God’s design, and that discipleship best happens in community. 7. That resurrection is real, and part of the promise for those that trust Jesus. We believe that heaven and earth will be brought together one day, renewing all things. We believe if people don’t want God (choosing not to receive Jesus), they can choose eternity without Him.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 17 May 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rural Ministries
PO Box 293
ROYSTON
SG8 1FS
- Phone:
- 01763 878539
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window