Accounts and annual returns RECREATION GROUND CHARLWOOD

Charity number: 200044
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 April 2025 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 April 2025 454 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 29 April 2025 819 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 April 2025 1184 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days