THE FEDERATION OF BRITISH ARTISTS

Charity number: 200048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Federation provides exhibition facilities and organises open art exhibitions for public viewing in the Mall Galleries. The open exhibitions provide opportunities for developing artists to exhibit alongside more established artists. Our education programme incorporates collaboration with people of all ages, backgrounds and abilities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 July 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FBA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Jane Ellison Chair 03 October 2023
None on record
Jonathan David Stevenson Coppin Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Monica He Hyun Won Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Dana Rebecca Arnold Trustee 02 October 2024
None on record
Benjamin Gordon Tobias Ward Trustee 03 October 2023
NEW ENGLISH ART CLUB
Received: On time
Luis Michael Morris Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Maxine Lesley Angus Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Carolyn Frances Simpson Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Martin Philip Howarth Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
MICHAEL FRANCIS DAVIES Trustee 12 October 2021
ROYAL SOCIETY OF BRITISH ARTISTS LIMITED
Received: On time
Richard Timothy Rees Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Nicholas David Glazebrook Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Robin Hazlewood Trustee 07 November 2019
THE ALDGATE AND ALLHALLOWS FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Eela Devani Trustee 07 November 2019
INDEPENDENT PUBLISHERS GUILD
Received: On time
Alastair Adams Trustee 25 July 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.65m £1.13m £1.38m £1.34m £1.62m
Total expenditure £1.68m £1.47m £1.47m £1.59m £1.52m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £126.04k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £10.35k £9.69k £4.61k £2.98k £32.39k
Income - Other trading activities £28.20k £15.20k £5.00k £6.00k £5.00k
Income - Charitable activities £1.46m £855.10k £1.22m £1.28m £1.54m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.97k £1.07k £41 £253 £4.99k
Income - Other £157.17k £245.21k £152.46k £45.91k £37.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.68m £1.46m £1.47m £1.59m £1.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.53k £4.66k £4.82k £4.81k £4.54k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £616.24k £441.19k £421.33k £376.18k £402.00k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.27m £777.43k £667.47k £629.35k £810.13k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £534.39k £332.62k £296.39k £463.75k £574.87k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 02 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 29 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 08 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FEDERATION OF BRITISH ARTISTS
17 CARLTON HOUSE TERRACE
LONDON
SW1Y 5BD
Phone:
02079306844