Richmond Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Richmond Foundation administers a royal gift made in 1786 to help the community in Richmond. Through grant-giving, education support and charitable housing we seek to improve the quality of life of disadvantaged people within our benefit area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£2,603,309
Donations and legacies | £106.64k | |
Charitable activities | £711.45k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.77m | |
Other | £11.59k |
Total expenditure:
£3,915,611
Raising funds | £452.05k | |
Charitable activities | £3.46m | |
Other | £0 |
£4,446,195 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £452.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.46m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £452.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.46m | |
Retained for future use | £3.13m |
People

7 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 July 1976: Standard registration
- RICHMOND PARISH CHARITY LANDS (Previous name)
- RICHMOND PARISH LANDS CHARITY (Previous name)
- RPLC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jerome Jude Misso | Chair | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Lester | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mary Elizabeth Frederica Henes | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
david herring | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Speak | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Duncan Richford | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Claire O'Donnell | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Ruth Scott | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Richard Pyne | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Chris Phillips | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROL FLETCHER | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOANNA MARGARET NAKIELNY | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Owen Carew-Jones | Trustee | 06 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.74m | £3.24m | £2.72m | £2.41m | £2.60m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.31m | £3.77m | £4.18m | £3.60m | £3.92m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £39.98k | £0 | £47.50k | £106.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £780.58k | £777.01k | £638.10k | £679.97k | £711.45k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.96m | £1.91m | £2.09m | £1.68m | £1.77m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £507.14k | £0 | £2.69k | £11.59k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.41m | £3.42m | £3.67m | £3.14m | £3.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £896.97k | £349.92k | £508.49k | £462.35k | £452.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £54.01k | £145.10k | £49.26k | £61.67k | £165.74k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £2.34m | £2.39m | £2.26m | £2.48m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £219.86k | £163.91k | £178.71k | £165.68k | £452.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £67.60m | £56.89m | £55.88m | £72.81m | £58.54m | |
|
Long-term investments | £38.99m | £57.03m | £57.96m | £41.83m | £58.41m | |
|
Other assets | £1.28m | £2.01m | £1.53m | £829.48k | £2.01m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £257.76k | £438.49k | £200.32k | £107.36k | £149.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 13/05/1991 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 27/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/12/2007 AS AMENDED ON 06/04/2010 AS AMENDED ON 17/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 24/09/2014 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2015 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 07 JUN 2016 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 FEB 2017 15 JUN 2017 AS AMENDED ON 30 JUL 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 01 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 05 JUL 2024 as amended on 18 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO FURTHER ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES:- (1) THE RELIEF OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES (THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID LONDON BOROUGH BEING HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS “THE SAID INHABITANTS”) WHO ARE POOR OR OTHERWISE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; (2) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AMONG THE SAID INHABITANTS; (3) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE) OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION; (4) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (5) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (WHETHER OR NOT OF A NATURE SIMILAR TO ANY OF THOSE HEREINBEFORE SPECIFIED) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) THE TRUSTEES MAY APPROPRIATE THE LAND AND BUILDINGS BELONGING TO THE CHARITY OR ANY PART THEREOF FOR USE FOR ANY PURPOSE WITHIN THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND UPON THAMES
Linked charities
- 05 July 1976 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
RICHMOND FOUNDATION
THE VESTRY HOUSE
21 PARADISE ROAD
RICHMOND
TW9 1SA
- Phone:
- 020 8948 5701
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window