The Barnes Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A grant-making charitable trust for the benefit of residents of Barnes, the objects of which are the relief of poverty, relief for the elderly, the relief of distress and sickness, the provision of facilities for recreation and leisure and education. The Walsingham Lodge Trust, a subsidiary charity, houses older Barnes residents who are in need of sheltered accommodation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£778,125
Donations and legacies | £934 | |
Charitable activities | £434.17k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £343.02k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£721,518
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £721.52k | |
Other | £0 |
£1,031,496 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £721.52k | |
Retained for future use | £56.61k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £721.52k | |
Retained for future use | £1.09m |
People

2 Employee(s)
1 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- 13 July 1987: Standard registration
- BARNES WORKHOUSE FUND (Previous name)
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Barnes Fund Trustee Limited | Trustee | 19 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £702.48k | £721.50k | £702.57k | £724.88k | £778.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £769.10k | £806.26k | £768.26k | £955.33k | £721.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £125 | £370 | £450 | £2.92k | £934 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £367.76k | £392.85k | £377.00k | £389.66k | £434.17k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £334.59k | £328.28k | £325.13k | £332.30k | £343.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £769.10k | £806.26k | £768.26k | £955.33k | £721.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £23.72k | £24.12k | £32.91k | £27.48k | £27.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £234.90k | £347.66k | £241.67k | £282.48k | £265.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.46m | £1.43m | £1.40m | £1.38m | £1.35m | |
|
Long-term investments | £11.25m | £11.64m | £13.56m | £11.83m | £12.69m | |
|
Other assets | £528.61k | £507.50k | £235.32k | £277.30k | £555.18k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £73.67k | £70.67k | £98.30k | £95.38k | £186.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 23 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 01/01/1970 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 02/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 17/09/2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 03 OCT 2017 as amended on 25 Jan 2018 as amended on 24 Feb 2020
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF BARNES AS FOLLOWS: 1) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR; 2) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; 3) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE) OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OF OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; 4) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF BARNES.
Linked charities
- 13 July 1987 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 347
Hampton
Middlesex
TW12 9ED
- Phone:
- 07484146802
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window