EDWIN ABBOTT MEMORIAL COTTAGES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of low cost housing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 22 June 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Arthur Cole | Chair | 19 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Sally Jane Shorthose | Trustee | 20 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Robert Harold Douglas | Trustee | 28 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Donald Tracy | Trustee | 04 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Deacon | Trustee | 15 August 2020 |
|
|||||
PAMELA HIBBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.00k | £11.07k | £16.13k | £16.76k | £15.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.41k | £2.34k | £2.04k | £2.09k | £6.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27/12/1933 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 06/03/1959 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 15/10/1987 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 06/08/2014
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF TWO ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
CHURT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Spring Valley
Churt Road
Churt
FARNHAM
Surrey
GU10 2QU
- Phone:
- 07734325130
- Email:
- juliadeacon322@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window