WALTER AND ELIZABETH CAREY CHARITY

Charity Number: 200163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

making small grants for the relief of poverty in the parish of Everton

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 July 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE CAREY TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard John Edwards Trustee 07 October 2016
None on record
Alison Joy Taylor Trustee 07 October 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £18 £19 £19 £20 £10
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
27 Sandy Road
Everton
SANDY
SG19 2JU
Phone:
01767681666
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available