RAVENSDEN COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the relief of poor and necessitous persons in the parish of Ravensden,Bedfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bedford
Governance
- 23 July 1963: Standard registration
- 12 November 2015: Funds received from 307457 RAVENSDEN COMMUNITY TRUST EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- TOWN AND POOR ESTATE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Collins | Trustee | 14 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Ferguson | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|||||
DAVID JACOBS | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BOTTOMLEY | Trustee | 10 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alison Baggott | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Liz Hine | Trustee | 06 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE RUSSELL | Trustee | 11 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.93k | £3.10k | £2.27k | £1.30k | £1.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.11k | £2.60k | £4.26k | £193 | £3.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 November 2022 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 03/12/1897 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/06/1963 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 26/05/2015
Charitable objects
ONE OF SUCH PARTS SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR EDUCATION IN SUPPORT OF RAVENSDEN SCHOOL AND RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF RAVENSDEN (AS DEFINED BY RAVENSDEN PARISH COUNCIL JURISDICTION). SUCH SUPPORT TO BE REQUESTED IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEES IDENTIFYING THE NEEDS AND REQUIREMENTS. ANY SURPLUS EACH YEAR MAY BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY IN FUTURE YEARS. THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME RE-APPLY SUCH SURPLUSES OR PART THEREOF TO THE CAPITAL INVESTED. THE REMAINING TWO THIRDS OF THE NET INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF THE PARISH OF RAVENSDEN (AS DEFINED BY RAVENSDEN PARISH COUNCIL JURISDICTION) AND THOSE IN NEED WITHIN IT. SUCH BENEFITS SHOULD BE REQUESTED IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEES IDENTIFYING THE NEEDS AND REQUIREMENTS. THE TRUSTEES MAY ALSO MAKE PAYMENTS FROM TIME TO TIME TO COMMUNITY PROJECT OR PERSONS IN NEED THAT HAVE BEEN IDENTIFIED BY OTHERS. ANY SURPLUS EACH YEAR MAY BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES TO APPLY IN FUTURE YEARS. THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME RE-APPLY SUCH SURPLUSES OR PART THEREOF TO THE CAPITAL INVESTED.
Area of benefit
RAVENSDEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WESTERLIES
CHURCH END
RAVENSDEN
BEDFORD
MK44 2RN
- Phone:
- 01234771919
- Email:
- alisonbaggott@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window