FEOFFEE OR CHARITY ESTATE

Charity number: 200188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Accommodation for residents living independently.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £27,474
Total expenditure: £26,837

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Central Bedfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 July 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE AMPTHILL FEOFFEE ESTATE CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Bartram Trustee 01 December 2024
THE AMPTHILL FEOFFEE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Recently registered
Susan Clinch Trustee 27 November 2024
THE AMPTHILL FEOFFEE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Recently registered
Spencer Rhys Bartle Trustee 29 May 2024
THE AMPTHILL FEOFFEE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Recently registered
Roy Frederick Tebbutt Trustee 25 May 2023
PARKSIDE COMMUNITY HALL
Received: On time
THE AMPTHILL FEOFFEE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Recently registered
Kenneth Ian Hamon Watt Trustee 10 March 2020
THE AMPTHILL FEOFFEE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Recently registered
Ian Donald Russell Titman Trustee 10 March 2020
THE AMPTHILL FEOFFEE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Recently registered
William Brian Kerr Trustee 10 March 2020
THE AMPTHILL FEOFFEE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Recently registered
Alan Read Trustee 18 March 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £24.43k £24.13k £24.53k £25.95k £27.47k
Total expenditure £19.26k £17.21k £16.56k £13.13k £26.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 04 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
103 Station Road
Ampthill
BEDFORD
MK45 2RE
Phone:
07702159065
Email:
No information available