Financial history AYLOTT JANES ALMSHOUSES

Charity Number: 200230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £143.54k £139.94k £148.97k £160.12k £173.02k
Total expenditure £157.25k £137.42k £133.15k £168.09k £139.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A