RAY'S CHARITY
Charity number: 200265
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Distributes income on investment between 6 persons over 50 living in Molesey
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Surrey
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 January 1962: Standard registration
- 01 June 2009: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £596 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 29 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 19 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 10 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 28 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF JAMES RAY PROVED IN THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY ON THE 23RD SEPTEMBER 1921
Charitable objects
FUNDS FOR CERTAIN AGED IN THE AREA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
EAST AND WEST MOLESEY AS CONSTITUTED PRIOR TO 1921
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window