WILLIAM CHARLES LEE SICK POOR FUND

Charity Number: 200301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity makes small cash grants to individuals thought to be in the greatest financial need and usually does this at the Christmas season. Benefit is restricted to persons resident in Windlesham and Valley End, Chobham.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £552
Total expenditure: £520

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Violet May Elizabeth Tedder Chair 08 December 2004
CHOBHAM POOR ALLOTMENTS
Received: On time
HENRY SMITH
Received: On time
W C LEE'S RESTHOUSES
Received: On time
CHOBHAM AND WEST END RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
Received: On time
MISS ANNE ELEANOR GOMM
Received: On time
SURREY HEATH BOROUGH COUNCIL MAYOR'S CHARITY
Received: On time
VALLEY END INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Councillor Emma-Jane McGrath Trustee 25 November 2019
W C LEE'S RESTHOUSES
Received: On time
MISS ANNE ELEANOR GOMM
Received: On time
Helen Hanson-Hjul Trustee 25 November 2019
None on record
LORD GLANUSK Trustee
None on record
JOAN ANNE WEYMOUTH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £515 £525 £536 £550 £552
Total expenditure £640 £640 £650 £640 £520
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 24 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TY TRAFAN
BRICK HILL
CHOBHAM
WOKING
GU24 8TG
Phone:
01276858441
Website:

No information available