ST ALBANS CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Society are as set out in its constitution and are in summary: a)to encourage high standards of architecture and town planning in and around St Albans; b)to stimulate public interest in, and care for, the beauty, history and character of the City and its surroundings; c)to encourage the preservation, development and improvement of the conditions in which to live and work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 21 July 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER MORTON | Trustee | 16 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Winifred Paton | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Cropper | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Pankhurst | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Conneely | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Prof Peter Thomas Newby | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
FREDA CHALONER CBE | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Robert Osborne | Trustee | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.14k | £5.69k | £8.21k | £8.02k | £8.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.89k | £4.29k | £11.91k | £6.03k | £9.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2ND JUNE 1961 AS AMENDED 14TH MAY 1993 AND 19TH OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN ST ALBANS AND ITS SURROUNDINGS (FOR FURTHR DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION).
Area of benefit
ST ALBANS AND SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Albert Street
ST. ALBANS
Hertfordshire
AL1 1RT
- Phone:
- 00000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window