Accounts and annual returns JOHNSON WAX LIMITED CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 200332
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2016 21 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 21 April 2017 On Time
Annual return 16 June 2015 14 April 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 16 June 2015 15 April 2016 On Time
Annual return 16 June 2014 24 March 2016 343 days late
Accounts and TAR 16 June 2014 23 March 2016 342 days late