MILFORD VILLAGE HALL FUND

Charity Number: 200343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Rental of Village Hall premises for a variety of events, both adhoc and regular rentals. Two offices, one at the rear and one at the front of the village hall rented to Witley Parish Council.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £27,436
Total expenditure: £47,515

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Animals
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Michael Henry Edwards Trustee 26 October 2022
THE FREDDIE GREEN AND FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE FREDDIE GREEN AND FAMILY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Katherine Elizabeth Smyth Trustee 26 October 2022
None on record
CHARLES SECRETT Trustee
None on record
JOHN HERRING Trustee
HAPPY CHILD INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £26.85k £26.62k £24.69k £26.22k £27.44k
Total expenditure £13.46k £18.65k £11.36k £28.59k £47.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £11.83k £8.57k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 01 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 21 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Milford Cottage
Portsmouth Road
Milford
GODALMING
Surrey
GU8 5HX
Phone:
07962171806