THURLEIGH CHURCH ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of the work of Thurleigh Parish Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bedford
Governance
- 15 August 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID FRASER | Trustee | 23 April 2019 |
|
|||||
LULU FISHER | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PAUL SINGLETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.40k | £629 | £10.95k | £11.76k | £12.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.26k | £3.00k | £11.62k | £12.11k | £10.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 01/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/09/2012 AS AMENDED ON 25/06/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO MAINTAIN THE FABRIC OF ST PETER’S CHURCH IN THE PARISH OF THURLEIGH, AND TO FURTHER THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE PARISH, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THURLEIGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 CROSS END
THURLEIGH
BEDFORD
MK44 2EE
- Phone:
- 01234 771856
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window