THE MICKLEHAM ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide residential accommodation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 29 August 1961: Standard registration
- THE MICKLEHAM ALMSHOUSES AND OTHERS (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN MARTIN BANFIELD | Chair |
|
||||||
Alan Jeffery Darling | Trustee | 12 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Feena Juliana Barros Graham | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Gerard Crossan | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Michael Wright | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elsie Rosam | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.38k | £37.36k | £37.51k | £37.13k | £41.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.68k | £22.83k | £21.15k | £31.43k | £25.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED THE 13 FEBRUARY 1846 AND SCHEMES OF 1 OCTOBER 1963 AND 21 OCTOBER 1974 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 04 APR 2017
Charitable objects
PROVISIONS OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF MICKLEHAM.IF THERE IS NO SUITABLE APPLICANT,THE TRUSTEES MAY APPOINT TO BE AN ALMS PERSON OR A POOR PERSON RESIDENT THE ARE OF THE MOLE VALLEY DISTRICT COUNCIL, OR WHO CAN DEMONSTRATE A CONNECTION WITH MICKLEHAM PARISH OR MOLE VALLEY DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF MICKLEHAM
Linked charities
- 29 August 1961 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Rectory
London Road
Mickleham
DORKING
RH5 6EB
- Phone:
- 01306881942
- Email:
- trevor.haylett9@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window