WIMBLEDON GUILD OF SOCIAL WELFARE (INCORPORATED)

Charity Number: 200424
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Wimbledon Guild is a dynamic charity with a longstanding heritage that helps local people to lead a better life by tackling poverty, supporting ageing & encouraging mental well-being. It provides support from the heart of the community by reaching out to people in the Merton borough with a range of services e.g. grants, counselling, outreach & activities for older people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Merton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 August 1961: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • WIMBLEDON GUILD (Working name)
  • WIMBLEDON GUILD (OF SOCIAL WELFARE) (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN ELIZABETH COOKE Chair
None on record
ENIOLA OLADIPO Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Frances Haque Trustee 24 October 2022
8TH WIMBLEDON SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Alexander Pfeifer Trustee 24 October 2022
None on record
Howard Richards Trustee 06 October 2020
None on record
Karen Biggs Trustee 06 October 2015
None on record
CAROLINE MAWHOOD Trustee 18 November 2012
None on record
AMIR SIDDIQUI Trustee
None on record
RICHARD ANDREW STEELE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.84m £1.60m £1.80m £2.26m £2.33m
Total expenditure £2.61m £2.42m £2.66m £2.86m £3.03m
Income from government contracts £78.90k £78.90k £78.90k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £204.00k £352.39k £304.71k £488.36k £338.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £83.64k £162.47k £118.78k £79.67k £90.69k
Income - Other trading activities £122.47k £53.76k £108.34k £90.99k £83.76k
Income - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.10m £1.21m £1.39m £1.44m
Income - Endowments £500 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £528.32k £277.68k £358.70k £697.72k £721.80k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £500 £4.21k £5.00k £5.52k £4.66k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.11m £2.03m £2.18m £2.48m £2.65m
Expenditure - Raising funds £497.36k £385.49k £482.88k £377.18k £378.54k
Expenditure - Governance £80.68k £80.57k £91.48k £92.69k £103.96k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £80.68k £77.34k £8.84k £45.26k £18.80k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £918.62k £871.35k £15.75m £14.68m £922.68k
Long-term investments £28.95m £32.16m £17.89m £17.58m £31.44m
Other assets £326.60k £322.64k £241.37k £264.87k £255.79k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £208.54k £181.05k £187.36k £273.11k £189.19k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 15 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 2 MARCH 1951 AND 25 JULY 1952
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR WOMEN AND CHILDREN OF WIMBLEDON, WANDSWORTH AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS.
Area of benefit
WIMBLEDON AND DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 09 August 1961 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Wimbledon Guild of Social Welfare
Guild House
30-32 Worple Road
LONDON
SW19 4EF
Phone:
02089460735