Governing document AGE CONCERN (MERTON)
Charity number: 200436
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 21 FEBRUARY 1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS PASSED 10TH JUNE 1975, 22ND SEPTEMBER 1980 AND 20TH SEPTEMBER 1982 AND 30TH JULY 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE MITCHAM AND COLLIERS WOOD AREA OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LONDON BOROUGH OF MERTON
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.