Accounts and annual returns MILWICH CHURCH HALL (TRUST NO 1195)

Charity number: 200445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 23 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2025 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 December 2022 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 December 2022 424 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required