MARY TATE'S ALMSHOUSES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide accommodation for single women, not less than 50 years of age, who are in need and who are members of the Church of England and have lived in the ancient parish of Mitcham for at least five years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Merton
- Surrey
Governance
- 30 August 1961: Standard registration
- 01 October 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 01 October 2013: Funds transferred to 204963 THE CROYDON ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.45k | £39.54k | £39.01k | £39.27k | £59.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.86k | £38.18k | £38.78k | £26.31k | £57.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 29 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 22 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 22 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 10 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 10 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 27 October 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 01/10/2013
Charitable objects
OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE RELIEF OF NEED BY THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFICIARIES; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
CROYDON & PARISH OF MITCHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window