SYDNEY HOWARD LOVELL MEMORIAL ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses for retired people. Priority given to those in 'tied accommodation' upon retirement
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
Governance
- 27 September 1961: Standard registration
- LOVELL HOMES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Patrick Long | Chair | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Worker | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Michael Williams | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Jane Saunders | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Karen Saunders | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Anne Walker Cllr | Trustee | 05 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Ann Evans | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Beazley | Trustee | 10 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Rachel Elizabeth Jane Saunders | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £216.04k | £213.11k | £210.93k | £219.54k | £226.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.60k | £94.12k | £246.65k | £194.74k | £175.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
1A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND B)SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 Gainsborough Rise
BEDFORD
MK41 7PR
- Phone:
- 07736466965
- Email:
- lovelltrust@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window