ASSOCIATED TAILORS ESTATES LIMITED BENEVOLENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty in defined groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 August 1961: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN BOWLES | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY SUTHERLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59 | £0 | £0 | £48 | £377 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 JULY 1961
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF NECESSITOUS AND DESERVING PERSONS WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN EITHER: (A) OFFICERS OR EMPLOYEES OF THE DONOR COMPANY OR WEAVER TO WEAVER LIMITED JOHN TEMPLE LIMITED SERVICE TAILORING COMPANY LIMITED OR ANY OTHER SUBSIDIARY OR ASSOCIATED COMPANY OF THE DONOR COMPANY; (B) WIVES, WIDOWS; HUSBANDS; WIDOWERS, CHILDREN, PARENTS OR OTHER DEPENDANTS OF ANY SUCH OFFICER OR EMPLOYEE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
EXPERIAN
80 VICTORIA STREET
LONDON
SW1E 5JL
- Phone:
- 02030424275
- Email:
- martin.bowles@experian.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window