WARLINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Warlingham Village Hall provides building facilities and space for the use of the general public for sports and recreation activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 October 1961: Standard registration
- WARLINGHAM VILLAGE CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna Patel | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
CLLR JEREMY PURSEHOUSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNDA PEACOCK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN AESCHLIMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSIE CONNERY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.82k | £15.05k | £30.67k | £22.68k | £15.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | £12.11k | £11.67k | £10.03k | £10.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £3.00k | £15.00k | N/A | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 February 2025 | 1106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1573 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 9 AUGUST 2005 AS AMENDED 15 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WARLINGHAM AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 OAKLEY ROAD
WARLINGHAM
CR6 9BE
- Phone:
- 01883623025
- Email:
- jeremy@enterpress.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window