Financial history PIRRIE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity Number: 200645
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £24.92k £14.62k £39.76k £33.10k £42.75k
Total expenditure £22.54k £12.92k £22.88k £31.16k £46.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A